skip to content

Singh, Ruby

CPSO#: 88482

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Halton Healthcare Services
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON
L6M 0L8
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ruby Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Singh ( CPSO# 88482 )

Business Address:
7030 Derry Road East
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RUBY SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 29 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2011