skip to content

Singh, Rittu Gill

CPSO#: 89144

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sint Eustatius, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
107 King Street West, Unit 1 (LL)
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Phone: (289) 238-9146
Fax: (855) 368-5397 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rittu Gill Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Singh ( CPSO# 89144 )

Business Address:
1-107 King Street West
Lower Level
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Phone Number: (289) 238-9146

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RITTU GILL SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2013 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2016