skip to content

Singh, Ravinderpal

CPSO#: 96801

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Dayanand Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ravinderpal Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Singh ( CPSO# 96801 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:13 Sep 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Feb 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2013 Active
             Dr. Ravinderpal Singh may practice medicine independently in internal medicine,
            only.