Singh, Ravi Paul (CPSO#: 91012)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: 705-522-2200 Ext. 7147
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. P. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Singh ( CPSO# 91012 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 522-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Feb 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAVI PAUL SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 07 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 08 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 13 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2012