skip to content

Singh, Ranjit

CPSO#: 28606

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ranjit Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 13 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 301 85 Norfolk Street Guelph ON N1H 4J4 Tel: 519-836-5940 Fax: 519-836-5637
Date Received: 05 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:25 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective:22 Apr 2016 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018