skip to content

Singh, Prabhjyot

CPSO#: 90341

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Nov 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
404-3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: 416 673 9393
Fax: 4166739394 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Prabhjyot Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Singh ( CPSO# 90341 )

Business Address:
Suite 401
520 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1R 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 673-9393

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PRABHJYOT SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 13 Apr 2009 to 03 May 2009
EL - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2015