skip to content

Singh, Navneet

CPSO#: 93579

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging-MG161
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Health Network
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-3131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Singh ( CPSO# 93579 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging - MG 161
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAVNEET SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019