skip to content

Singh, Kunwar Raj

CPSO#: 24370

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2020
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Spanish, Telugu, Urdu

Education:Osmania University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kunwar Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd 1 High Meadow Pl Unit 13 North York, ON M9L 0A3 Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 20 Dec 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:08 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1971
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 13 Sep 1991
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 13 Mar 1992
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 1996
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 28 Feb 1997
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 May 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 May 2003
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 19 Sep 2003
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 20 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2020

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 May 2020
Summary:

On May 11, 2020, on the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts on Liability and 
Admission, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario (“the College”)found that Dr. Kunwar Raj Singh (“Dr. Singh”) committed an act of 
professional misconduct, in that in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  
 
BACKGROUND 
 
The facts set out in the Agreed Statement of Facts on Liability and Admission included 
the following: 
 
Dr. Singh is a 78 year-old physician who received his certificate of registration 
authorizing independent practice from the College on December 29, 1971. He obtained 
a RCPSC certification in paediatrics in November 1973. Dr. Singh resigned his 
membership with the College effective January 1, 2020. At all relevant times, Dr. Singh 
practised paediatrics at a medical clinic at 483 East Street North in Sarnia, Ontario.  
 
January 14, 2013 undertaking to the College   
 
On January 14, 2013, Dr. Singh entered into an undertaking with the College. This 
undertaking superseded and replaced a prior undertaking that Dr. Singh had entered on 
August 20, 2009. Among other specified terms, the January 14, 2013, undertaking 
prohibited Dr. Singh from having in-person professional encounters with female 
patients, or female parents or caregivers of patients, except in the presence of a female 
chaperone approved by the College (the “Practice Monitor”). Dr. Singh was required to 
ensure that the Practice Monitor initialed each patient chart for which she was present. 
The undertaking also required Dr. Singh to place signs in clearly visible locations in all 
waiting rooms and examination rooms which stated: “Dr. Singh will only see female 
patients and female parents/caregivers of patients in the presence of another 
registered health professional.”  
 
Patient DD was a female patient of Dr. Singh between approximately March 2018 and 
October 2018. Patient DD saw Dr. Singh on seven separate occasions for medical 
appointments at his clinic at 483 East Street North in Sarnia. Patient DD’s Mother and 
Father brought Patient DD to all her appointments with Dr. Singh and both parents were 
present in the examination room during each appointment. During a number of these 
appointments, Dr. Singh’s Practice Monitor was not present in the examination room for 
the entirety of Patient DD’s appointments. Patient DD’s parents did not have any 
concerns in respect of Dr. Singh’s care and treatment of Patient DD.  
 
On December 6, 2018, a Compliance Monitor of the College attended at Dr. Singh’s 
office to conduct a compliance visit. During the visit, Dr. Singh stated that two or three 
times a year, he conducted examinations of patients with hemangiomas in Room 4. Dr. 
 Singh stated that the required signage was never posted in Room 4 because he rarely 
 used the room for examinations of patients, including Patient DD.     
  
 On May 3, 2019, the Compliance Monitor conducted a further compliance visit at 
 Dr. Singh’s office. The Compliance Monitor observed that the required sign was now 
posted in Room 4, unlike at the previous visit. 
  
 On March 20, 2018, Compliance Monitors of the College attended Dr. Singh’s office to 
 conduct a compliance visit. During the compliance visit, the Compliance Monitors found 
 that on two different dates for two different patients, the Practice Monitor had not 
 signed the patients’ charts. The log sheets for both patients’ appointments were 
 initialed by the Practice Monitor and were faxed to the College prior to the Compliance 
 Monitor’s visit.    
  
 The Committee also received an Agreed Statement of Facts Regarding Penalty which 
 included the following facts: 
  
 Undertaking to resign and never apply or reapply 
 
On December 20, 2019, Dr. Singh entered into an undertaking to the College whereby he 
 agreed to resign from the College, effective January 1, 2020, and never apply or re-apply 
 for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. This undertaking 
 arose after the College conducted investigations into whether Dr. Singh sexually abused 
 patients in approximately the 1970’s and 1980’s in his paediatric practice.  
  
 Discipline Committee History  
  
 In November 1991, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Singh engaged in 
 professional misconduct in that he was guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to 
 practice, failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, and engaged in 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. The Discipline Committee 
 ordered a suspension of Dr. Singh’s licence to practise medicine for two years, the first 
 six months commenced on a date fixed by the Registrar after the Order became final, 
 and the remaining 18 months of the suspension were suspended subject to specified 
 terms in the Order. The Committee also ordered a reprimand and that the reprimand be 
 recorded on the Register.  
  
 In August 1994, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Singh engaged in professional 
 misconduct in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. 
 The Discipline Committee ordered a six-month suspension of Dr. Singh’s certificate of 
 registration, the final three months of the suspension to be suspended if Dr. Singh 
 completed a course in medical ethics. The Committee also ordered a reprimand and 
 that the reprimand be recorded on the Register.  
        
Additional facts 
       
On November 1, 2019, Dr. Singh’s Practice Monitor was interviewed by College 
representatives. She stated that although she was not always present in the 
examination room during Patient DD’s appointments, she was either standing in the 
hallway immediately outside the examination room or had left the room briefly, at Dr. 
Singh’s request, to retrieve documents requested by him.   
       
DISPOSITION 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered: 
 
   -  Dr. Singh to attend before the panel to be reprimanded 
   -  Dr. Singh to pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within 30 days 
      of the date of the Order.

Hearing Date(s): May 11, 2020 at 1:30 p.m.

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Aug 1994
Summary:

 In August 1994, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Kunwar Raj Singh guilty of  professional 
 misconduct, as defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged 
 in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that he be reprimanded, with the fact of the 
 reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The Committee also ruled that Dr. Singh's licence to 
 practice be suspended for a period of six months, with the last three months of the suspension to 
 be themselves suspended provided that he pursued and completed, at the direction of, and to the 
 satisfaction of the Registrar, a course of study in medical ethics.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 01 Oct 1996
Hearing Date(s): Aug 25, 1994

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Nov 1991
Summary:

 In November 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Kunwar Raj Singh guilty of professional 
 misconduct, as defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged 
 in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Singh be reprimanded, with the fact 
 of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The Committee further ruled that the Doctor's 
 licence to practice be suspended for a period of two years.  The final eighteen months of this 
 period of suspension, however, would themselves be suspended provided that Dr. Singh meet the 
 following conditions:  (a) that he not be referred to the Discipline Committee and found guilty of 
 a similar act of professional misconduct with a parent of a patient or staff member of a health 
 facility or hospital in the four year period after this Order became final; and (b) that if Dr. 
 Singh were referred to the Discipline Committee on a similar act of professional misconduct, he 
 would either agree to the expeditious hearing of the charges within sixty days of receipt of the 
 Notice of Hearing setting out the charges; or would agree to the suspension of his practice until 
 the disposition of the charges against him.

Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 11 Sep 1991

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: December 20, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kunwar Raj Singh to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 20, 2019:

The College conducted investigations into whether Dr. Singh sexually abused patients in approximately the 1970’s and 1980’s in his pediatric practice. In the face of the investigations, Dr. Singh agreed to resign from the College, effective January 1, 2020, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.