skip to content

Singh, Jessica

CPSO#: 92822

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Simcoe Muskoka
Regional Cancer Program
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M6M2
Phone: 705-728-9090 Ext. 43333
Fax: 705-739-5619 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jessica Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Singh ( CPSO# 92822 )

Business Address:
Simcoe Muskoka
Regional Cancer Program
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 03 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
EL - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 30 Jul 2010 to 24 Aug 2010
EL - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2013