skip to content

Singh, Jagdeep

CPSO#: 85963

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Feb 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

3001 Hospital gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: 905-845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jagdeep Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Singh ( CPSO# 85963 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (706) 536-3300


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Georgia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:09 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAGDEEP SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2008

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: March 23, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective January 15, 2020, Dr. Singh has completed all components of this SCERP dated March 23, 2017.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: March 23, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective January 15, 2020, Dr. Singh has completed all components of this SCERP dated March 23, 2017.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)