skip to content

Singh, Inderjit

CPSO#: 92212

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kashmiri, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Kashmir University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
45 Kenilworth Ave North Unit # 1
Hamilton ON  L8H 4R4
Phone: (289) 389-4422
Fax: (289) 389-2211 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Inderjit Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Singh ( CPSO# 92212 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
45 Kenilworth Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8H 4R4
Phone Number: (289) 389-4422

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. INDERJIT SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 20 Oct 2009 to 12 Jan 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jan 2010 to 20 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2010 to 19 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2012