skip to content

Singh, Gurdeep

CPSO#: 101271

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:R. G. Kar Medical College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Owen Sound Family Health Team
Suite 2000
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: 519 370 4066 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gurdeep Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Singh ( CPSO# 101271)

Business Address:
Owen Sound Family Health Team
Suite 2000
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 470-3030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GURDEEP SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015