skip to content

Singh, Farid

CPSO#: 89919

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Oct 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Oct 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Ross University School of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3730 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

621 10th Street
Niagara Falls NY  14301
United States
County: 
Electoral District: 

200-217 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON  N3R 1G8
Canada
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: F. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Singh ( CPSO# 89919 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 336-4125


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Minnesota
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:20 Oct 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Oct 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2010 Active
             Dr. Farid Singh may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry, only.