skip to content

Singh, Evelyn Hemwantie

CPSO#: 22101

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jul 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Names: Doobay, Evelyn Hemwantie (used until: 01 May 2001 )     Doobay, Evelyn Hemwantie (used until: 30 Apr 2001 )     Singh, Evelyn Hemwantie (used until: 08 Apr 2001 )     Singh, Evelyn Hemwantie (used until: 31 Aug 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: 416-781-9083 or 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 23 Dec 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2015