skip to content

Singer, Michael Alan

CPSO#: 23581

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jun 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CDK family medicine walk-in clinic
175 Princess St
Kingston
Ontario
Kingston ON  K7K5V6
Phone: (613) 766 0318
Fax: (613) 766 0339 Electoral District: 06

Medical Records Location

Address: Paper records: 36 Florence St Kingston ON K7M 1Y6 Electronic records: CDK Clinic 175 Princess St Kingston ON K7L 1A9
Date Received: 13 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALAN SINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1971