skip to content

Singer, Henry Norman

CPSO#: 18519

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Apr 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Oct 1962

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Singer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: KISS Storage (416)-663-5477
Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact KISS Storage by telephone. If KISS Storange does not have the medical records, patients may contact the College for further assistance.
Date Received: 22 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:16 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Apr 2017