Singarayer, Ranjit (CPSO#: 100847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Endocrine Division
3rd Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416)323-7510
Fax: (416)323-6360
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MCI - Atrium
595 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G2R3
Canada
Phone: (416)598-1703
Fax: (416)598-1778
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANJIT SINGARAYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGARAYER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2017