skip to content

Singarayer, Chandrakumar

CPSO#: 85849

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Dec 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Dec 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1J 0C7
Phone: (905) 721-4363 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Singarayer Medicine Professional Corporation/Singarayer Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Singarayer ( CPSO# 85849 )

Business Address:
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-4363

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 May 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2008 Active
             1.    Dr.  Chandrakumar  Singarayer  may  practise independently in the area of
                  family medicine only; 

                  (a)   Dr. Singarayer's practice shall  not  include obstetrics in the 2nd
                        and 3rd trimesters of patient care.