skip to content

Singam, Thiru

CPSO#: 91498

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Apr 2019
EXPIRY DATE
08 Oct 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 Apr 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Apr 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2019
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 08 Oct 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2019 Active
             1.    Dr.  Thiru  Singam  may practise internal medicine with Sunnybrook Health
                  Sciences Centre  in Toronto, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated
                  by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  eighteen  months
                  from the date of issuance.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor  notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Singam's knowledge,  skill,  judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College  by  the  due  date  or  if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Singam's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining to the  on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Singam's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on April 9, 2019, and will expire on or before
                  October 8, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.