skip to content

Sindhupakorn, Bura

CPSO#: 88180

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Mahidol University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 17 Mar 2008 to 09 Jun 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Jun 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2009