Sinclair Mills, Christa (CPSO#: 92837)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Senior Peoples' Resources in
North Toronto (SPRINT)
2nd Floor
140 Merton Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1A1
Phone: (416) 481-5099
Fax: (416) 481-2590
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christa Sinclair Mills Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sinclair Mills ( CPSO# 92837 )

Business Address:
Senior Peoples' Resources in North Toronto
2nd Floor
140 Merton Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1A1
Phone Number: (416) 481-5099

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTA SINCLAIR MILLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINCLAIR MILLS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012