skip to content

Sin, Jean Hin Leo

CPSO#: 86321

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering
Department of Emergency Medicine
580 Harwood Ave South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 4162817404
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Leo Sin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sin ( CPSO# 86321 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Ajax and Pickering
Department of Family Medicine
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7270

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEAN HIN LEO SIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009