skip to content

Simpson, Robert Alan

CPSO#: 26093

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Apr 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 Apr 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert Alan Simpson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 30 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: 7193 Middlebrook Road Flora ON N0B 1S0
Date Received: 31 Mar 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2021