skip to content

Simons, Janet

CPSO#: 97600

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Health Sciences Centre Room 3N26D 1200 Main Street West Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Date Received: 13 Jul 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Biochemistry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 2017