skip to content

Simons, Frances Elinor

CPSO#: 90324

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Hospital for Sick Children 555 University Avenue Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016