skip to content

O'Brien, Simon Jonathan

CPSO#: 66990

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Meltzer, Simon Jonathan (used until: 12 Jun 2000 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 603 Stn Main
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: 613 544 9121
Fax: 6123 544 9793 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3400
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

130 Ontario Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2Y4
Canada
Phone: (613) 544 4900 Ext. 53130
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

kingston health sciences center
78 stuart street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: 613 548 3232
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

130 Ontario St
Kingston ON  K7L 2Y4
Canada
Phone: 613 544 9121
Fax: 6123 544 9793
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Simon O'Brien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. O'Brien ( CPSO# 66990 )

Business Address:
78 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 544-4900

Business Address:
130 Ontario Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2Y4
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SIMON JONATHAN O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. O’Brien’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. O’Brien failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in his care, including his medical record-keeping, for Patient A, including by failing to maintain appropriate professional boundaries; engaging inappropriately with confidential work product and personal information and/or personal health information of third parties provided to him by Patient A; and failing to make mandatory reports as required under the Highway Traffic Act. It is further alleged that Dr. O’Brien failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by practicing outside of his scope of practice as a psychiatrist, and in relation to his provision of prescriptions for Patient A’s pet and Patient A’s relative.

It is also alleged that Dr. O’Brien is incompetent

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Merits: 2022-12-20