skip to content

Simms, Richard James

CPSO#: 31486

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 May 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 May 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
PO Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Fax: 7054355131 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Simms Omylanowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 13 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD JAMES SIMMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMMS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2015