skip to content

Simmons, Rachel Ann

CPSO#: 96845

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 Oct 2014
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Indiana University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Howard Mutual Medical Centre
Box 667
20129 Erie Street South
Ridgetown ON  N0P 2C0
Phone: (519) 674-2600 Ext. 1 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rachel A. Simmons Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Simmons ( CPSO# 96845 )

Business Address:
Howard Mutual Medical Centre
Box 67
20129 Eries Street South
Ridgetown ON  N0P 2C0
Phone Number: (519) 674-2600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Sep 2012 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2016

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2016 Active
             Dr. Rachel Ann Simmons may practise medicine independently in family medicine.