skip to content

Simmons, Rachel Ann

CPSO#: 96845

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Indiana University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Howard Mutual Medical Centre
Box 667
20129 Erie Street South
Ridgetown ON  N0P 2C0
Phone: (519) 674-2600 Ext. 1 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rachel A. Simmons Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Simmons ( CPSO# 96845 )

Business Address:
Howard Mutual Medical Centre
Box 67
20129 Eries Street South
Ridgetown ON  N0P 2C0
Phone Number: (519) 674-2600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Sep 2012 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2016 Active
             Dr. Rachel Ann Simmons may practise medicine independently in family medicine.