skip to content

Simmons, Elizabeth Laura

CPSO#: 27210

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Feb 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 200-785 Wonderland Rd S. London, Ontario N6R 1M6
Date Received: 30 Apr 2020


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to: Attn: Operating Room Dr. Elizabeth Simmons Lakeridge Health Oshawa 1 Hospital Court Oshawa, ON L1G 2B9 *Patients should indicate the date of their last visit to Dr. Simmons (that is how the records are arranged).
Date Received: 26 Oct 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020