skip to content

Simeunovic, Branko

CPSO#: 86027

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leamington Sleep Laboratory
33 Princess St.
Suite 305
Leamington ON  N8H 5C5
Phone: 519-325-1333
Fax: 519-325-1338 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bluewater Sleep Disorders Clinic
1258 Michigan Ave.
Sarnia ON  N7S 3Y2
Canada
Phone: 519-332-5333
Fax: 519-332-5444
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

17 Park Ave. E.
Chatham ON  N7M3V3
Canada
Phone: 519-352-7378
Fax: 519-352-7376
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

55 Edinborough St.
Windsor ON  N8X 3C3
Canada
Phone: 5192580585
Fax: 5192586304
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Simeunovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Simeunovic ( CPSO# 86027 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Sleep Disorders Clinic
1258 Michigan Avenue
Sarnia ON  N7S 3Y2
Phone Number: (519) 332-5333

Business Address:
Leamington Sleep Laboratory
33 Princess Street
Suite 305
Leamington ON  N8H 5C5
Phone Number: (519) 325-1333

Business Address:
17 Park Avenue East
Chatham ON  N7M 3V3
Phone Number: (519) 352-7378

Business Address:
2125 Front Road
La Salle ON  N9J 2C1
Phone Number: (519) 734-1234

Business Address:
55 Edinborough Street
Windsor ON  N8X 3C3
Phone Number: (519) 258-0585

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRANKO SIMEUNOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMEUNOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Mar 2007 to 22 Apr 2007
EL - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Jul 2007 to 29 Jul 2007
EL - Respirology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2009