skip to content

Simard, Robert Daniel

CPSO#: 91028

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Services
Room C7 53
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4037
Fax: 416-480-4704 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Mary's General Hospital
c/o Emergency Department
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: 519-749-6910
Fax: 519-749-6411
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Grand River Hospital
c/o Emergency Department
835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: 519-749-4300 Ext. 4242
Fax: 519-749-4285
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St. 1NW-126
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: 416-756-6165
Fax: 416-756-6151
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Simard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Simard ( CPSO# 91028 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Services
Room C7 53
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4037

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Suite 1NW-126
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6165

Business Address:
835 King Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6910

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT DANIEL SIMARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014