skip to content

Simard, Joseph Bruno Albert Renald

CPSO#: 24280

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Aug 1995

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre 505 Smyth Road Ottawa, ON K1H 8M2
Date Received: 22 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:18 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 May 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015