skip to content

Silverman, Jason Andrew

CPSO#: 92428

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:31 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:06 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 18 Jan 2010 to 14 Feb 2010
EL - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 25 Oct 2010 to 19 Nov 2010
EL - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 18 Nov 2013 to 15 Dec 2013
EL - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2013