skip to content

Silecky, Walter Bohdan

CPSO#: 30685

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jan 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 May 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University Of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Walter Silecky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 2 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: Oshawa Clinic, 117 King Street E, Oshawa L1H 1B9; Tel: (905) 721-3505
Date Received: 01 Dec 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2021