skip to content

Silbernagel, Lana Rochelle

CPSO#: 97757

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Psychiatry
Room 4418
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8955 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LANA ROCHELLE SILBERNAGEL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SILBERNAGEL is enrolled at UNDEFINDED YET;

(2) Dr. SILBERNAGEL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SILBERNAGEL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SILBERNAGEL shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SILBERNAGEL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SILBERNAGEL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2022.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 May 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Jan 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022