skip to content

Siew, Dou-Anne Natasha

CPSO#: 96192

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Feb 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:James Cook University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 20 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Apr 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Hematology

Western University, 01 Jul 2019 to 27 Sep 2019
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2019
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020