skip to content

Sievenpiper, John Lamport

CPSO#: 91363

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
#6138-61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3732
Fax: (416) 867-7495 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Biochemistry Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN LAMPORT SIEVENPIPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIEVENPIPER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Biochemistry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014