skip to content

Sieniawski, Rafal

CPSO#: 94916

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4440 Tecumseh Rd E
Central Cardiology Clinic
Windsor ON  N8W 1K5
Phone: (519) 916-0993
Fax: (519) 916-0994 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sieniawski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sieniawski ( CPSO# 94916 )

Business Address:
Windsor Cardiac Centre
Unit 5
130 Ouellette Place
Windsor ON  N8X 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 250-4449

Business Address:
2464 Howard Avenue
Suite 201
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 977-6643

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAFAL SIENIAWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIENIAWSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2014