skip to content

Siedlecki, Jacqueline Barbara Caroline

CPSO#: 90165

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Feb 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Jan 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Calgary, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jacqueline Barbara Caroline Siedlecki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
British Columbia
Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Feb 2017