skip to content

Siebert, Lee Francis

CPSO#: 28716

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Aug 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lee F. Siebert Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Command Document Storage and Records Management 100 Piccadilly Street London, ON N6A 1R8 Tel: 519 672 1460 Fax: 519 672 8096
Date Received: 14 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2015