skip to content

Sidiropoulos, Konstantinos

CPSO#: 100853

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sidiropoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sidiropoulos ( CPSO# 100853)

Business Address:
QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belle River ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KONSTANTINOS SIDIROPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDIROPOULOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018