skip to content

Sidhu, Gurmeet Singh

CPSO#: 91809

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Sardar Patel Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1718 King St E
Cambridge ON  N3H 3R8
Phone: (519) 219-8999
Fax: (519) 219-7999 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gurmeet Singh Sidhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sidhu ( CPSO# 91809 )

Business Address:
Unit 107
10095 Bramalea Road
Brampton ON  L6R 0K1
Phone Number: (905) 793-3311

Business Address:
16 - 2120 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 792-0100

Business Address:
1718 King Street East
Cambridge ON  N3H 3R8
Phone Number: (519) 219-8999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GURMEET SINGH SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010