skip to content

Sidhu, Bikrampal Singh

CPSO#: 97970

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: 613-544-3400 Ext. 3212
Fax: 613-545-2204 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bikrampal S. Sidhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sidhu ( CPSO# 97970 )

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BIKRAMPAL SINGH SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016