skip to content

Sider, Douglas Michael

CPSO#: 54982

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Mar 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Mar 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Public Health Services
100 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6 Electoral District: 04

Medical Records Location

Address: Public Health Ontario 300-480 University Ave Toronto ON M5G 1V2
Date Received: 11 Jul 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective:01 Dec 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS MICHAEL SIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2020