skip to content

Siddiqui, Zubaida -

CPSO#: 86158

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 22 Jan 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pashto, Persian, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Elliot Lake Family Health Clinic
31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1Y9
Phone: (705) 461-8882
Fax: (705) 848-3449 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Josephs General Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Canada
Phone: (705) 848-7182
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Zubaida Siddiqui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Siddiqui ( CPSO# 86158 )

Business Address:
Elliot Lake Family Health Clinic
31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1Y9
Phone Number: (705) 461-8882

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 21 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 22 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 27 Jan 2021 Active
 As from January 22, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Zubaida Siddiqui in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Siddiqui to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of

DR. ZUBAIDA SIDDIQUI
("Dr. Siddiqui")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")

A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 

"NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, certificate of registration number 86158, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge that following two public complaints that raised concerns about my family medicine practice, including in the emergency room ("ER") setting, I underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of both my office-based family medicine and my ER practice. The reassessment reports subsequently received by the College raised ongoing concerns about my standard of practice in both settings. 

B.	UNDERTAKING

(4)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5)	Clinical Supervision (ER practice)

(a)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the "ER Clinical Supervisor" or "ER Clinical Supervisors"), in my ER practice, for at least six (6) months ("ER Clinical Supervision"). 

(b)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge that I have reviewed the ER Clinical Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and understand what is required of the ER Clinical Supervisor. The ER Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 

(i)	Facilitate the education program set out in the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as Appendix "C";

(ii)	Review the materials provided by the College and have an initial meeting to discuss the objectives for the ER Clinical Supervision and practice improvement recommendations;

(iii)	Meet with me at my Practice Location once every week for a minimum of four (4) weeks;

(iv)	After a minimum of four (4) weeks of ER Clinical Supervision, if my ER Clinical Supervisor recommends and the College approves a reduction in the level of supervision, my ER Clinical Supervisor will meet with me at my Practice Location once every two (2) weeks for an additional minimum period of two (2) months; 

(v)	After a minimum of two (2) additional months of ER Clinical Supervision, if my ER Clinical Supervisor recommends and the College approves a reduction in the level of supervision, my ER Clinical Supervisor will meet with me at my Practice Location once every month for a further three (3) months;

(vi)	Directly observe all of my patient encounters during one full shift in the emergency department at each meeting;

(vii)	In addition to those patient encounters observed under (vi), review at least 15 additional patient charts from my ER practice at each meeting; 

(viii)	Discuss any concerns arising from the observation or chart reviews;

(ix)	Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations; 

(x)	Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the ER Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my ER Clinical Supervision; and

(xi)	Submit written reports to the College at least once every week for four (4) weeks or until the College approves a reduction in the level of supervision, and then once every month for the next two (2) months or until the College approves a further reduction in the level of supervision, then once at the end of supervision, or more frequently if the ER Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.

(c)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the ER Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "C", as well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor regarding my ER practice, received November 17, 2020, and concerns that may arise during the period of ER Clinical Supervision.

(d)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my ER practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my ER Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.

(e)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

(f)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(g)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, undertake that if I am unable to obtain an ER Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or (f) above, I will cease practising emergency medicine until such time as I have obtained an ER Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  

(h)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge that if I am required to cease my emergency medicine practise as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

(6)	Clinical Supervision (Office practice)

(a)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the "Office Clinical Supervisor" or "Office Clinical Supervisors"), in respect of my office-based family medicine practice ("Office practice"), for at least six (6) months ("Office Clinical Supervision"). 

(b)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Office Clinical Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "B", and understand what is required of the Office Clinical Supervisor. The Office Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 

(i)	Facilitate the education program set out in the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as Appendix "C";

(ii)	Review the materials provided by the College and have an initial meeting to discuss the objectives for the Office Clinical Supervision and practice improvement recommendations;

(iii)	Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every month for six (6) months;

(iv)	Review at least fifteen (15) of my Office practice patient charts at every meeting; 

(v)	Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;

(vi)	Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations; 

(vii)	Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Office Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Office Clinical Supervision; and

(viii)	Submit written reports to the College at least once every month for the first three months, and once at the end of the Office Clinical Supervision, or more frequently if the Office Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.

(c)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "C", as well as the areas of concern identified in the report and addendum of the assessor in regards to my office-based family medicine practice, received July 15, 2020 and July 20, 2020 respectively, and concerns that may arise during the period of Office Clinical Supervision.

(d)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my Office practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix "B" to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my Office Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.

(e)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, undertake to ensure that Appendix "B" to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

(f)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "B" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(g)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, undertake that if I am unable to obtain an Office Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or (f) above, I will cease practising in my Office practice until such time as I have obtained an Office Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  

(h)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge that if I am required to cease my Office practise as a result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

(7)	Professional Education  

(a)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "C", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i)	Medical Record Keeping Workshop, University of Toronto;

(ii)	Updated ACLS certification;

(iii)	Review, reflection, discussion with my ER or Office Clinical Supervisor (or both as specified below), and completion of a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:  

Both practices:

1.	Antibiotic stewardship, Choosing Wisely Canada;

2.	Medical Records Management, College Policy;

3.	Medical Record Documentation, College Policy; 

ER practice:       
   
4.	Relevant sections of core Emergency Medicine texts (e.g. Rosens or Tintinalli), EM cme/podcasts such as EMRAP and EM Cases, and Up to Date; 

Office practice:

5.	College's Opioid Position Statement;

6.	2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic Non-Cancer Pain;

7.	2018 Diabetes Guideline, Diabetes Canada; 

8.	2018 Hypertension Canada Prevention and Treatment Guidelines, Hypertension Canada; 

(iv)	Review, reflection and discussion with my ER and Office Clinical Supervisors of the Anti-infective Guidelines for Community-acquired Infections, MUMS Health; and

(v)	any additional professional education recommended by my ER or Office Clinical Supervisor.

(b)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, at the first possible opportunity thereafter.

(d)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge that if any of the programs listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(8)	Reassessment of Practice

(a)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in sections (5) and (6) above and Appendix "A" and "B" to this Undertaking, and the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (7) above, I will submit to a reassessment of both my office and emergency practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of thirty (30) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 

(c)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 

(d)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 

(9)	Monitoring 

(a)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(d)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "D" and Appendix "E", respectively. 

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(10)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(11)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(12)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(13)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(14)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

(15)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(16)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Siddiqui underwent remediation and a reassessment of her family medicine practice in the office and emergency department settings. The reassessment reports subsequently received by the College raised ongoing concerns about Dr. Siddiqui's practice in both settings. As a result:

Dr. Siddiqui will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor in both her office and emergency practice for 6 months. 

Dr. Siddiqui will engage in professional education, including in medical record-keeping, the evaluation and management of abnormal vital signs, falls in elderly patients, sore throat, and abdominal pain in the emergency department, antibiotic stewardship, management of chest pain and blood pressure, and prescribing of benzodiazepines.

Dr. Siddiqui's office and emergency practice will be reassessed by an assessor or assessors selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

(c)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D.	CONSENT

(17)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(19)	I, Dr. Siddiqui, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertakings set out at Appendix "A" and Appendix "B" to this Undertaking;

(c)	any information relevant to the Reassessment;

(d)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  

(e)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.



Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 22, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Zubaida Siddiqui to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 22, 2021:

Dr. Siddiqui underwent remediation and a reassessment of her family medicine practice in the office and emergency department settings. The reassessment reports subsequently received by the College raised ongoing concerns about Dr. Siddiqui’s practice in both settings. As a result:

Dr. Siddiqui will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor in both her office and emergency practice for 6 months.

Dr. Siddiqui will engage in professional education, including in medical record-keeping, the evaluation and management of abnormal vital signs, falls in elderly patients, sore throat, and abdominal pain in the emergency department, antibiotic stewardship, management of chest pain and blood pressure, and prescribing of benzodiazepines.

Dr. Siddiqui’s office and emergency practice will be reassessed by an assessor or assessors selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

 

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: September 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Siddiqui entered into an undertaking with the College effective January 22, 2021. The Undertaking supersedes the the September 19, 2018 SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: September 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Siddiqui entered into an undertaking with the College effective January 22, 2021. The Undertaking supersedes the the September 19, 2018 SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: October 5, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)