skip to content

Siddiqui, Nausheen Fatima

CPSO#: 87068

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: 647-776-2762
Fax: 647-436-3161 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N. F. Siddiqui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Siddiqui ( CPSO# 87068 )

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7

Business Address:
Suite 209
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (647) 776-2762

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAUSHEEN FATIMA SIDDIQUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011