skip to content

Siddiqi, Nilofar

CPSO#: 87142

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room no 7201 A
1800 8th Street E
Grey Bruce Health Services
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Ext. 2469
Fax: (519) 371-7695 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nilofar Siddiqi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Siddiqi ( CPSO# 87142 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Family Medicine
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NILOFAR SIDDIQI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 01 Nov 2008 to 26 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 27 Jan 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010