skip to content

Mukherjee, Siddhartha

CPSO#: 88251

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Sep 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Mar 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:Burdwan Medical College, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
Lorrain Centre
Room C328
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone: (613) 635-7900
Fax: (613) 635-7900 Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 28 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2019
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2019
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 04 Sep 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2019 Active
             As from 4:00 p.m., March 4, 2019, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following term, condition
            and limitation is imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Siddhartha Mukherjee:

                  Dr. Mukherjee will, at his own expense, participate in and successfully
                  complete comprehensive and intensive instruction in anger management
                  approved by the College, no later than twelve (12) months from the date
                  of this Order.

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 04 Mar 2019
Summary:

On March 4th, 2019, on the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts Re Liability, the Discipline 
Committee found that Dr. Siddhartha Mukherjee committed an act of professional misconduct, in 
that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise and 
engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regarding to all 
the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional. 

AGREED STATEMENT OF FACTS RE LIABILITY 

Dr. Siddhartha Mukherjee (“Dr. Mukherjee”) is a 57 year-old obstetrician/gynecologist. Dr. 
Mukherjee treated Ms. B as a patient in May and June 2009, when Ms. B attended at the 
Emergency Department at the Hospital and for a subsequent consultation. Ms. B was referred 
again to Dr. Mukherjee for a consultation concerning a different matter in June 2010. He did not 
see her as a patient after June 2010.  

Dr. Mukherjee next encountered Ms. B when she was completing a nursing placement in the 
labour and delivery ward at the Hospital where Ms. B subsequently worked as a part-time RN.  
Ms. B also worked as an RN in Dr. Mukherjee’s office.  

Dr. Mukherjee was involved in an extra-marital sexual relationship with Ms B. During their 
relationship, Dr. Mukherjee prescribed a common antibiotic for Ms. B’s two children and 
Lorazepam for Ms. B for five days. Both Ms. B and her children had their own family doctor for 
the duration of the relationship. 

Dr. Mukherjee’s wife learned of the affair. Dr. Mukherjee’s relationship with Ms. B deteriorated. 
Ms. B told Dr. Mukherjee on several occasions that she wanted to end the relationship, but Dr. 
Mukherjee pleaded for it to continue. During the relationship, Ms. B became financially 
dependent on Dr. Mukherjee. Dr. Mukherjee threatened to end Ms. B’s employment at his office, 
and take gifts back or demand to be repaid for cash gifts he had previously made to her. 
Ultimately, Ms. B went to the police. 

Dr. Mukherjee was found guilty by Justice Selkirk of the Ontario Court of Justice of the 
following offences under the Criminal Code of Canada, committed against Ms. B: 

   a) mischief (two counts) pursuant to section 430(4); and 

   b) uttering threats to cause death or bodily harm pursuant to section 264.1 (1)(a). 

The first mischief offence occurred when Dr. Mukherjee broke into the door of Ms. B’s house 
leading from the garage when she was not home, damaging the door. Dr. Mukherjee was enraged 
and wanted to confront Ms. B. 

The second mischief occurred when Dr. Mukherjee deliberately drove his car into Ms. B’s car, 
thereby damaging it. After driving into her car once, Dr. Mukherjee reversed his car and drove 
into Ms. B’s car again. Ms. B backed up her car and drove to the police station but did not go in.  

Dr. Mukherjee uttered threats to Ms. B by text messages on three occasions. On one occasion, 
Dr. Mukherjee texted Ms. B, “[Ms. B’s name] someday I will slit Ur throat - I m slick surgeon u 
should know that” [sic]. On another occasion, Dr. Mukherjee texted Ms B, “U have got me mad I 
m fuckjng killing u” [sic] and “I will kill u someday” [sic]. Dr. Mukherjee’s threats were 
intended to intimidate Ms. B.  

Dr. Mukherjee was sentenced to a conditional discharge and 12 months’ probation. 

ADMISSION 

Dr. Mukherjee admits the facts above and admits that the conduct described constitutes an act of 
professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his 
suitability to practice under clauses 51(1)(a) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, 
Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c.18; and that he has 
engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
to all of the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional contrary to section 1(1)33 of O.Reg. 856/93 made under the 
Medicine Act, 1991. 

AGREED STATEMENT OF FACTS RE PENALTY 

Dr. Siddhartha Mukherjee (“Dr. Mukherjee”) was sentenced to a conditional discharge and 12 
months’ probation. Dr. Mukherjee fulfilled all the terms of the conditional discharge, which 
included: complying with a safety plan as set out by the Hospital; making a $1,000 charitable 
donation to the Bernadette McCann House; and completing a 12-session counseling and 
rehabilitation program for resolving conflict in non-abusive ways (“Living Without Violence”). 

Dr. Mukherjee’s privileges at the Hospital have never been limited or restricted. Dr. Mukherjee 
voluntarily entered into an agreement with the Hospital to ensure that he did not encounter Ms. B 
in the workplace (“safety plan”). Dr. Mukherjee was required to comply with the safety plan as 
part of his bail conditions and subsequently as part of his probation. The agreement also required 
him to reflect on what had occurred by engaging in psychotherapy sessions (including cognitive 
behavioural therapy) for a period of time to be determined by the therapist, and to work with a 
workplace mentor. Dr. Mukherjee has complied with all of these obligations to the full 
satisfaction of the hospital. Ms. B no longer works at the hospital. 

Dr. Mukherjee has undergone therapy and remediation, including: 
      -  Successful completion of the Partner Assault Response Program aka Living Without 
         Violence. 
      -  Successful completion of the Understanding Boundaries course, at his own expense, 
         at the Schulich School of Medicine & Dentistry in London, Ontario. 
      -  Assessment by forensic psychiatrist as required by the hospital, as well as completion 
         of psychotherapy sessions (twelve hours, including cognitive behavioural therapy), at 
         his own expense, with psychotherapist Michele Riopelle. Ms. Riopelle’s opinion 
         included that Dr. Mukherjee was fully engaged in receiving psychotherapy and 
         gained understanding, insight and self-awareness throughout the therapeutic process. 
         According to Ms. Riopelle: 
            -  “…I believe Dr. Mukherjee, found himself in a position, based on 
               vulnerability in his home life, that escalated beyond what he could have 
               foreseen given his experience, knowledge, information, and vulnerabilities at 
               that time.” 
            -  Working with a workplace mentor at the Hospital on a monthly basis to 
               discuss and review his conduct and interpersonal performance in the 
               workplace, as required by his agreement with the hospital. 

Dr. Mukherjee’s probation ended on February 23, 2016. Since then, Dr. Mukherjee has had no 
further criminal charges and/or convictions.  

Dr. Mukherjee cooperated with the College’s investigation. He has had no previous findings 
before the Discipline Committee. 

DISPOSITION 

The Discipline Committee ordered that: 
   -  Dr. Mukherjee attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
       
   -  The Registrar suspend Dr. Mukherjee’s certificate of registration for a period of six (6) 
      months, commencing immediately, and that Dr. Mukherjee comply with College Policy 
      #2-07 “Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take 
      an Extended Leave of Absence or Close their Practice Due to Relocation”. 
       
   -  The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Mukherjee’s 
      certificate of registration: 
            (a)  Dr. Mukherjee will, at his own expense, participate in and successfully 
            complete comprehensive and intensive instruction in anger management approved 
            by the College, no later than twelve (12) months from the date of  this Order. 

   -  Dr. Mukherjee pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within 30 days of the 
      date of the order. 
Dr. Mukherjee waived his right to an appeal under subsection 70(1) of the Code and the 
Committee administered a public reprimand.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): March 4, 2019 hearing start time 1:00 p.m.