skip to content

Siddall, Laura Syrene

CPSO#: 86442

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Feb 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Feb 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Two Rivers Family Health Team
Unit 12
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 629-4615
Fax: (519) 629-4630 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Laura Siddall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 3 2021
Corporation Name: Dr. Laura Siddall Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Siddall ( CPSO# 86442 )

Business Address:
B12-350 Conestoga Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Feb 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURA SYRENE SIDDALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2010